Global Patent Index - EP 1021608 A1

EP 1021608 A1 2000-07-26 - FINISHING FOR JEANS MATERIAL

Title (en)

FINISHING FOR JEANS MATERIAL

Title (de)

AUSRÜSTUNG VON JEANSMATERIAL

Title (fr)

APPRET POUR TISSU DE JEANS

Publication

EP 1021608 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942976 A

Priority

  • EP 98942976 A
  • EP 97810730 A
  • IB 9801514 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918280A1] An anti-yellowing finishing process for textile, blue-dyed, anti-back-stained, stone-washed and/or bleached denim articles is characterised in that the textile materials are finished in an aqueous medium with protonated fatty acid ester aminoamides and/or hydroxyaminoamides of N-( beta -hydroxyethyl)-ethylene diamine, in which the fatty acid radicals contain 12 to 22 carbon atoms, and which are protonated with at least 1.5 equivalents ortho-phosphoric acid per equivalent of basic amino groups.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 13/46; D06P 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 13/46 (2006.01); D06M 16/00 (2006.01); D06P 5/02 (2006.01); D06P 5/06 (2006.01); D06P 1/22 (2006.01); D06P 1/649 (2006.01); D06P 1/651 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 16/003 (2013.01); D06P 5/02 (2013.01); D06P 5/06 (2013.01); D06P 1/228 (2013.01); D06P 1/6495 (2013.01); D06P 1/6496 (2013.01); D06P 1/6497 (2013.01); D06P 1/65118 (2013.01); D06P 1/65125 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2915 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918280A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918280 A1 19990415; CA 2305673 A1 19990415; DE 59801470 D1 20011018; EP 1021608 A1 20000726; EP 1021608 B1 20010912; ES 2164455 T3 20020216; PT 1021608 E 20020228; TR 200000831 T2 20010723; US 6547832 B1 20030415; ZA 9808970 B 20000403

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031011

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-04-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CLARIANT FINANCE (BVI) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020930

2003-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-11-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021102

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-02-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20010401968

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011203

2002-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2164455

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-02-08 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET1

2001-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-12-05 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011205

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-10-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011019

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801470

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-18

2001-09-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010928

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-09-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010919

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-09-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010917

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-09-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD.

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GR IT LI PT

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GR IT LI PT