Global Patent Index - EP 1021617 A1

EP 1021617 A1 2000-07-26 - SHOE PRESS

Title (en)

SHOE PRESS

Title (de)

SCHUHPRESSE

Title (fr)

PRESSE A SABOT

Publication

EP 1021617 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946773 A

Priority

  • SE 9801762 W
  • SE 9703571 A
  • SE 9704235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916971A1] A shoe press for a paper or board machine, comprising a press shoe (1) and a counter roll (2), which between themselves form an extended nip (N) for a paper or cardboard web and a circulated flexible belt (3), and at least one loading cylinder (6) which is arranged between a horizontal beam (4) included in the frame system (4, 5) of the shoe press and the press shoe (1) and adapted to press the press shoe (1) against the counter roll (2). The press shoe is arranged on top of the loading cylinder and there is a device for securing the loading cylinder (6) on the horizontal beam (4), said securing being releasable. With the aid of eccentric means (16, 18, 19) arranged on both sides of, seen in the machine direction, the loading cylinder/each loading cylinder (6), the loading cylinder is actuatable, after releasing the securing, for moving it in the machine direction for regulating the pressure profile of the shoe press.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0218 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916971A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817097 U1 19981126; AT 236293 T 20030415; AT 3120 U1 19991025; DE 69812984 D1 20030508; DE 69812984 T2 20031204; EP 1021617 A1 20000726; EP 1021617 B1 20030402; SE 510609 C2 19990607; SE 9704235 D0 19971119; SE 9704235 L 19990331; WO 9916971 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-09-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69812984 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT