Global patent index - EP 1021629 A1

EP 1021629 A1 2000-07-26 - PLAIN ROOF TILES

Title (en)

PLAIN ROOF TILES

Title (de)

DACHZIEGEL

Title (fr)

TUILES DE COUVERTURE PLATES

Publication

EP 1021629 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946602 A

Priority

  • GB 9803037 W
  • GB 9721622 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919579A1] A plain roof tile has an upper surface (21) of which a lower surface area is visible when the tile is laid with other such tiles to form a roof, an under surface (28), and being shaped during manufacture to enable the visible surface area, when a plurality of such tiles are stacked one on top of another to form a stack, to be spaced from, and remain out of contact with, an oppositely facing under surface (28) area of the immediate overlying tile of the stack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919579A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919579 A1 19990422; AU 9360298 A 19990503; EP 1021629 A1 20000726; EP 1021629 B1 20040506; GB 9721622 D0 19971210

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081009

2009-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081009

2009-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081009

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021203

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB IE