Global Patent Index - EP 1021630 A1

EP 1021630 A1 2000-07-26 - DEVICE FOR LINKING REINFORCED CONCRETE ELEMENTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR LINKING REINFORCED CONCRETE ELEMENTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN VON ARMIERTEN BETONTEILEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LIER DES ELEMENTS DE BETON ARME

Publication

EP 1021630 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98940129 A

Priority

  • DE 29711542 U
  • DE 29711544 U
  • EP 9804123 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6308478B1] The invention relates to a device enabling reinforced concrete elements (1, 2) to be linked by means of metal cables, certain portions of which are inserted into the just made concrete (1) while the cable portions which are not inserted protrude into the enclosure formed by the second contiguous concrete element (2). The first concrete element (1) presents a reinforcement which terminates in the area of contact with the second concrete element (2). In parallel or extension to said reinforcement of the first concrete element, pieces of metal cable (4) are inserted so as to provide either spaces for locating the cable free ends in the first concrete element, or passages in the enclosure formed by said first concrete element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/12; E04C 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E04C 5/02 (2006.01); E04C 5/16 (2006.01); E04F 19/00 (2006.01); E04G 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/125 (2013.01); E04G 21/126 (2013.01); E04B 1/0038 (2013.01); E04C 5/02 (2013.01); E04F 19/00 (2013.01); Y10T 403/475 (2013.01); Y10T 403/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6308478 B1 20011030; AT 209286 T 20011215; AU 8855498 A 19990125; CZ 296916 B6 20060712; CZ 9904796 A3 20000614; DK 1021630 T3 20020521; EP 1021630 A1 20000726; EP 1021630 B1 20011121; ES 2166183 T3 20020401; HU 0002654 A2 20001228; HU 0002654 A3 20030728; HU 223050 B1 20040301; PL 338048 A1 20000925; WO 9901630 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160704

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160917

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166183 T3

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802763 20020221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209286 T 20011215

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE