Global patent index - EP 1021653 A1

EP 1021653 A1 2000-07-26 - COOLED SCREW VACUUM PUMP

Title (en)

COOLED SCREW VACUUM PUMP

Title (de)

GEKÜHLTE SCHRAUBENVAKUUMPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A VIDE A VIS REFROIDIE

Publication

EP 1021653 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937514 A

Priority

  • DE 19745616 A
  • EP 9803756 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19745616A1] The cooled helical pump comprises a pump rotor (5) at one end of the shaft (6) carried in two bearings (7,8) in a finned housing (4). A pump (36) circulates cooling fluid through the space (31) from which the near bearing (7) is separated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/16; F04C 23/00; F04C 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/16 (2006.01); F04C 23/00 (2006.01); F04C 25/02 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 23/001 (2013.01); F04C 18/16 (2013.01); F04C 29/04 (2013.01); F04C 2240/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919630A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19745616 A1 19990415; EP 1021653 A1 20000726; EP 1021653 B1 20020807; JP 2001520352 A 20011030; JP 4225686 B2 20090218; TW 430722 B 20010421; US 6544020 B1 20030408; WO 9919630 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130619

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805126

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130619

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120619

2013-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120830

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-01-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805126

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-12

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010926

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI