Global Patent Index - EP 1021654 A1

EP 1021654 A1 2000-07-26 - SCREW VACUUM PUMP PROVIDED WITH ROTORS

Title (en)

SCREW VACUUM PUMP PROVIDED WITH ROTORS

Title (de)

SCHRAUBENVAKUUMPUMPE MIT ROTOREN

Title (fr)

POMPE A VIDE A VIS POURVUE DE ROTORS

Publication

EP 1021654 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937515 A

Priority

  • DE 19745615 A
  • EP 9803757 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19745615A1] Each of the rotors (5) has at least two sections (17,18) with different rotor profiles (19,20). The suction side section has a greater diameter than the pressure-side section. The suction-side section is produced with a greater tolerance than the pressure-side section. Rotor cooling apparatus is situated in a bearing-side open cavity (31) in the rotor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/16; F04C 18/08; F04C 23/00; F04C 29/04; F04C 29/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/16 (2006.01); F04C 18/08 (2006.01); F04C 23/00 (2006.01); F04C 25/02 (2006.01); F04C 28/26 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 28/26 (2013.01); F04C 18/084 (2013.01); F04C 23/001 (2013.01); F04C 23/008 (2013.01); F04C 29/04 (2013.01); F04C 18/16 (2013.01); F04C 2220/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919631A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19745615 A1 19990415; EP 1021654 A1 20000726; EP 1021654 B1 20041006; JP 2001520353 A 20011030; JP 4146081 B2 20080903; TW 452631 B 20010901; US 6382930 B1 20020507; WO 9919631 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110619

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812093

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110619

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100618

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080516

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812093 P 20041111

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI