Global Patent Index - EP 1021655 A1

EP 1021655 A1 2000-07-26 - DELIVERY PUMP

Title (en)

DELIVERY PUMP

Title (de)

FÖRDERPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE D'ALIMENTATION

Publication

EP 1021655 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965618 A

Priority

  • DE 19744037 A
  • EP 9806291 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918356A1] The invention relates to a delivery pump (2) for delivering fuel in a motor vehicle, comprising an impeller (7) with blade chambers (10, 10a, 11, 11a) which are delimited by guide blades (12, 13), and channels (14, 15) in the shape of incomplete circles. Said channels (14, 15) are located in housing parts (3, 4) adjacent to the impeller (7), in the area of the blade chambers (10, 10a, 11, 11a). The inventive pump also has a degasification channel (19), the start of said degasification channel being situated behind an inlet channel (8). Some of the blade chambers (10) are connected to the degasification channel (19) via pockets (20) incorporated in the impeller (7). This degasification channel (19) provides a reliable means of guiding the gas bubbles present in the fuel out of the delivery pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 5/00; F04D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 5/00 (2006.01); F04D 9/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 9/002 (2013.01); F04D 5/002 (2013.01); F04D 29/188 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918356A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918356 A1 19990415; BR 9813023 A 20000815; DE 19744037 C1 19990602; EP 1021655 A1 20000726; EP 1021655 B1 20020327; ES 2175847 T3 20021116; US 6309173 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061003

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2005-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175847 T3

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803554 20020502

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010801

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB