Global Patent Index - EP 1021677 A1

EP 1021677 A1 2000-07-26 - PROJECTOR DEVICE WITH LINEAR REFLECTOR

Title (en)

PROJECTOR DEVICE WITH LINEAR REFLECTOR

Title (de)

STRAHLER MIT LANGGESTRECKTEM REFLEKTOR

Title (fr)

PROJECTEUR A REFLECTEUR LINEAIRE

Publication

EP 1021677 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964436 A

Priority

  • EP 9807573 W
  • IT VT980001 U
  • IT VT980003 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940361A1] In the projector device (50) the projector (10) comprises a light source (14) and a reflector (12). This latter (12) has a surface obtained by causing a suitable plane line to translate such that the surface thus obtained is able to generate a light beam having a substantially rectangular cross section, a dimension of which decreases in receding from the reflector (12) until it becomes reduced to a strip (16), this dimension then increasing on continuing to recede from the reflector (12). Optical devices such as colour filters, colour changer means (20A, 20B, 22A, 22B, 24A, 24B), filters for converting the colour temperature, mechanical dimmers (18) and obscurers can be located at or in the vicinity of that position (16) in which the cross section of the light beam has minimum width. Optical prisms, lenses and diffusers can also be provided. A control unit (52) can also be provided, possibly comprising electronic dimmers, and actuator means (60) for executing the functions of the projector (10) and for moving it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21P 3/00; F21V 9/10; F21V 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 10/02 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 9/10 (2006.01); F21V 13/08 (2006.01); F21V 13/12 (2006.01); F21V 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 13/12 (2013.01); F21S 10/02 (2013.01); F21V 7/0025 (2013.01); F21V 7/005 (2013.01); F21V 9/10 (2013.01); F21V 13/08 (2013.01); F21V 23/0435 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940361A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940361 A1 19990812; AT 200146 T 20010415; AU 1963799 A 19990823; CA 2320478 A1 19990812; CN 1099541 C 20030122; CN 1263589 A 20000816; DE 69800646 D1 20010503; DE 69800646 T2 20010920; DK 1021677 T3 20010430; EP 1021677 A1 20000726; EP 1021677 B1 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081124

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-01-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2003-07-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STUDIO DUE LIGHT DIVISION S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021124

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011217

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800646 20010503

2001-04-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200146 T 20010415

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STUDIO DUE LIGHT DIVISION S.R.L.

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 10/02 A, 7F 21V 7/00 B, 7F 21V 9/10 B

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE