Global Patent Index - EP 1021755 A2

EP 1021755 A2 2000-07-26 - INTERSTITIAL CONTENT DISPLAY USING EVENT-CAPTURE CODE RUNNING IN WEB BROWSER ADDRESS SPACE

Title (en)

INTERSTITIAL CONTENT DISPLAY USING EVENT-CAPTURE CODE RUNNING IN WEB BROWSER ADDRESS SPACE

Title (de)

INTERSTITIELLE INHALTSANZEIGE DURCH DEN LAUF EINES EREIGNISERFASSINGSKODES INNERHALB EINES WEB-BROWSER-ADDRESSRAUMS

Title (fr)

AFFICHAGE DE CONTENU INTERSTITIEL PAR UTILISATION D'UN CODE DE SAISIE D'EVENEMENTS EVOLUANT DANS L'ESPACE ADRESSE D'UN NAVIGATEUR WEB

Publication

EP 1021755 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97954777 A

Priority

  • US 9722380 W
  • US 3198796 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9825198A2] An interstitial content display system and method for a Web browser wherein given executable code (42) shares the Web browser's address space (44) and is used to capture Web browser events. The Web browser events, in turn, are used to drive a display engine (48) that generates a viewer window. The viewer window preferably includes appropriate user interface controls, and it is re-positionable and re-sizable both manually and automatically. In operation, the executable code is responsive to a given browser event, such as activation of a URL in a source Web page, for controlling the display engine to overlay the viewer window on the browser display window and to display given content therein during the interstitial delay period while the browser waits for return of the target Web page. Upon a given occurrence, such as receipt of the target Web page (or some portion thereof), the user window may be selectively hidden or re-sized and re-positioned (into a so-called "mini-window") to allow the interstitial content display to complete without interfering with the user's viewing of the target Web page.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/14 (2006.01); G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/542 (2013.01); G06F 9/4443 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9825198 A2 19980611; WO 9825198 A3 19981008; AU 6011998 A 19980629; CA 2309634 A1 19980611; EP 1021755 A2 20000726; EP 1021755 A4 20000809; KR 20000057440 A 20000915

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031111

2000-08-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 3/00 A, 7G 06F 9/46 B, 7G 06F 9/44 B

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990615

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE