Global Patent Index - EP 1021756 A1

EP 1021756 A1 2000-07-26 - DIRECT MEMORY ACCESS (DMA) TRANSACTIONS ON A LOW PIN COUNT BUS

Title (en)

DIRECT MEMORY ACCESS (DMA) TRANSACTIONS ON A LOW PIN COUNT BUS

Title (de)

DIREKT-SPEICHERZUGRIFF / TRANSAKTIONEN AUF EIN BUS MIT NIEDRIGER PINANZAHL

Title (fr)

TRANSACTIONS D'ACCES DIRECT A LA MEMOIRE DANS UN BUS A FAIBLE NOMBRE DE BROCHES

Publication

EP 1021756 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98934188 A

Priority

  • US 9813402 W
  • US 93631897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915949A1] A system including a host (102) coupled to a memory device (108) and a peripheral controller device (120). The host (102) is coupled to the peripheral controller device (120) via bus (124) having a plurality of general purpose signal lines to carry time-multiplexed address, data, and control information. The peripheral controller device (120) performs a direct memory access (DMA) transactions with the memory device (108) via the host (102) the bus (124).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915949 A1 19990401; AU 8377098 A 19990412; CN 1126015 C 20031029; CN 1301361 A 20010627; DE 69828074 D1 20050113; DE 69828074 T2 20051222; EP 1021756 A1 20000726; EP 1021756 A4 20001220; EP 1021756 B1 20041208; HK 1028459 A1 20050715; US 6157970 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-02-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-07-15 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028459

2005-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828074 P 20050113

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2000-12-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 3/00 A, 7G 06F 13/28 B

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT