Global Patent Index - EP 1021766 A1

EP 1021766 A1 2000-07-26 - ITINERARY BASED AGENT MOBILITY INCLUDING MOBILITY OF EXECUTABLE CODE

Title (en)

ITINERARY BASED AGENT MOBILITY INCLUDING MOBILITY OF EXECUTABLE CODE

Title (de)

ROUTEN-BASIERTE AGENTMOBILITÄT MIT AUSFÜHRBARER KODE-MOBILITÄT

Title (fr)

MOBILITE D'UN AGENT EN FONCTION D'UN ITINERAIRE, COMPRENANT LA MOBILITE D'UN CODE EXECUTABLE

Publication

EP 1021766 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97948189 A

Priority

  • US 9720232 W
  • US 3090696 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9821863A1] A dynamic synchronous collaboration framework utilizes a distributed synchronizated point to permit synchronous collaboration of mobile agent objects (28, 30, 32) in a distributed computer system. The framework simplifies agent collaboration for applications which divide a complex problem into multiple tasks and delegate tasks to multiple mobile agents. The collaboration framework also enables mobile agents (28, 30, 32) within an application to perform synchronous collaboration with affiliated agents in the native language of an associated software application. Such collaboration is accomplished by joining collaborating agents to an agent group (26). Member agents periodically correlate results through a collaborative sharing within the agent group, and may adopt new behaviors based on the results of the collaboration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/16 (2006.01); G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 9/50 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06N 5/04 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/4862 (2013.01); G06F 9/465 (2013.01); G06F 9/52 (2013.01); H04L 67/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9821863 A1 19980522; AU 5171798 A 19980603; AU 5430498 A 19980603; EP 0938798 A1 19990901; EP 0938798 A4 20030212; EP 1021766 A1 20000726; EP 1021766 A4 20030312; JP 2001502093 A 20010213; JP 2001504609 A 20010403; WO 9821662 A1 19980522

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-03-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 13/00 A, 7G 06F 9/46 B

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990611

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE