Global Patent Index - EP 1021786 A1

EP 1021786 A1 2000-07-26 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CREATING A VIRTUAL MICROSCOPE SLIDE

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CREATING A VIRTUAL MICROSCOPE SLIDE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES VIRTUELLEN MIKROSKOPISCHEN OBJEKTTRÄGERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR CREER UNE LAME DE MICROSCOPE VIRTUELLE

Publication

EP 1021786 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908834 A

Priority

  • US 9804011 W
  • US 80585697 A
  • US 3251498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839728A1] A virtual microscope slide is created by using a computer-controlled microscope (10) to capture a plurality of low magnification images of a specimen which are tiled to create a reconstructed macro image (24). A plurality of higher magnification images are also captured and tiled to create a micro image (26). The macro (26) and micro (24) images are then stored, along with their mapping coordinates for later, interactive viewing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 21/36 (2006.01); G01N 15/14 (2006.01); G02B 21/00 (2006.01); G06F 19/00 (2011.01); G06K 9/00 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G06T 3/40 (2006.01); H04N 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 3/4038 (2013.01); G01N 15/1475 (2013.01); G02B 21/367 (2013.01); G06F 19/321 (2013.01); G06F 19/3406 (2013.01); G06F 19/366 (2013.01); G06K 9/00127 (2013.01); G06F 19/3418 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99942 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99943 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99945 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839728 A1 19980911; AU 6541298 A 19981022; AU 6677098 A 19980922; DE 69834564 D1 20060622; DE 69834564 T2 20070426; DE 69838297 D1 20071004; DE 69838297 T2 20080515; EP 1016031 A1 20000705; EP 1016031 A4 20011128; EP 1016031 B1 20070822; EP 1021786 A1 20000726; EP 1021786 A4 20011128; EP 1021786 B1 20060517; EP 1686533 A2 20060802; EP 1686533 A3 20061004; EP 1686533 B1 20091014; EP 2124188 A1 20091125; EP 2124188 B1 20110615; JP 2001519944 A 20011023; JP 2002514319 A 20020514; JP 2009037250 A 20090219; JP 4230542 B2 20090225; JP 4237264 B2 20090311; JP 4789989 B2 20111012; US 2003123717 A1 20030703; US 2004236773 A1 20041125; US 2005254696 A1 20051117; US 6272235 B1 20010807; US 6522774 B1 20030218; US 6775402 B2 20040810; US 7146372 B2 20061205; US 8625920 B2 20140107; WO 9844446 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-05-06 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-05-06 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: OLYMPUS AMERICA INC.

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2009-03-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OLYMPUS AMERICA INC.

- Free text: BACUS LABORATORIES, INC.#410 EISENHOWER LANE NORTH#LOMBARD, IL 60148 (US) -TRANSFER TO- OLYMPUS AMERICA INC.#3500 CORPORATE PARKWAY P.O. BOX 610#CENTER VALLEY, PA 18034 (US)

2009-03-18 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20080930

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BACUS LABORATORIES, INC.

- Free text: BACUS LABORATORIES, INC.#410 EISENHOWER LANE NORTH#LOMBARD, IL 60148 (US) -TRANSFER TO- BACUS LABORATORIES, INC.#410 EISENHOWER LANE NORTH#LOMBARD, IL 60148 (US)

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HESP TECHNOLOGY S.R.L.

2007-04-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HESP TECHNOLOGY S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20070216

2006-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-08-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69834564 P 20060622

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-03-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BACUS LABORATORIES, INC.

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2001-11-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991004

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE