Global Patent Index - EP 1021805 A1

EP 1021805 A1 2000-07-26 - METHOD FOR CONDITIONING A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONDITIONING A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES DIGITALEN SPRACHSIGNALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'UN SIGNAL DE PAROLE NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1021805 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98943997 A

Priority

  • FR 9801978 W
  • FR 9711641 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2768545A1] Putting several samples through discreet Fourier transform process and estimating tonal frequency along with its harmonics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 7/06; G10L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/02 (2013.01); G10L 19/02 (2013.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01); G10L 25/78 (2013.01); G10L 25/93 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0364 (2013.01); G10L 19/0212 (2013.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01); G10L 25/78 (2013.01); G10L 25/93 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914744A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768545 A1 19990319; FR 2768545 B1 20000713; AU 9168798 A 19990405; CA 2304013 A1 19990325; DE 69802431 D1 20011213; DE 69802431 T2 20020718; EP 1021805 A1 20000726; EP 1021805 B1 20011107; US 6775650 B1 20040810; WO 9914744 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060916

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060916

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050902

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS FRANCE

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802431 20011213

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 11/04 A, 7G 10L 21/02 B

2000-11-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONDITIONING A DIGITAL SPEECH SIGNAL

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB