Global patent index - EP 1021814 A2

EP 1021814 A2 2000-07-26 - FLOW HOLE AND FLOW PROJECTION

Title (en)

FLOW HOLE AND FLOW PROJECTION

Title (de)

DURCHFLUSS ÖFFNUNG UND DURCHFLUSSVORSPRUNG

Title (fr)

ORIFICE DE PASSAGE ET PARTIE SAILLANTE DE PASSAGE

Publication

EP 1021814 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98902727 A

Priority

  • US 9801534 W
  • US 79616597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835371A2] An electromagnetic relay includes a base, a bobbin with a core and at least one winding about the core, a pair of pole pieces extending perpendicularly from the ends of the core, an elongate armature movable with respect to a movable contact, a permanent magnet coupled magnetically between the core and armature and at least one stationary contact. The bobbin further comprises a set of end flanges adjacent the pole pieces, with a means for engaging the end flanges with the pole pieces. The base is provided with a hole therein for inserting an epoxy to bond the bobbin to the base. The cross-sectional area of the core is non-uniform to engage a pair of pole pieces. A bore within the bobbin has a non-uniform cross-sectional area. A bobbin is also provided with depressions at various locations of the flanges and with terminal wires molded within the flanges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/22; H01H 50/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/44 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01); H01H 50/36 (2006.01); H01H 50/16 (2006.01); H01H 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/042 (2013.01); H01H 50/023 (2013.01); H01H 50/021 (2013.01); H01H 50/026 (2013.01); H01H 50/14 (2013.01); H01H 50/163 (2013.01); H01H 51/2272 (2013.01); H01H 2050/446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835371A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835371 A2 19980813; WO 9835371 A3 19981105; CN 1129940 C 20031203; CN 1246957 A 20000308; DE 69802955 D1 20020124; DE 69802955 T2 20020808; EP 1021814 A2 20000726; EP 1021814 B1 20011212; JP 2001510628 A 20010731; KR 20000070845 A 20001125; TW 405137 B 20000911

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69802955

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070126

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070126

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070126

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69802955

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-24

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010423

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTROMECHANICAL COMPONENTS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990625

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT