Global Patent Index - EP 1021815 A1

EP 1021815 A1 2000-07-26 - MICROMECHANICAL ELECTROSTATIC RELAY AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

MICROMECHANICAL ELECTROSTATIC RELAY AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

MIKROMECHANISCHES ELEKTROSTATISCHES RELAIS UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

RELAIS ELECTROSTATIQUE MICROMECANIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1021815 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98947333 A

Priority

  • DE 9802092 W
  • DE 19736674 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736674C1] The relay has a base substrate (4) with a base electrode (1,11) and at least one fixed contact (7) at the end of a fixed contact spring tongue. This cooperates with a movable contact (8) at the end of an armature spring tongue (41), secured to the base substrate at the opposite end. The armature spring tongue is curved away from the substrate so that the contacts are spaced in the normal position, both spring tongues from a common carrier layer, with the attached contacts positioned so that they overlap in the closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B81B 3/00 (2006.01); B81C 1/00 (2006.01); H01H 59/00 (2006.01); H01L 41/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 59/0009 (2013.01); H01H 2059/0081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910907A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736674 C1 19981126; CA 2300956 A1 19990304; CN 1310854 A 20010829; EP 1021815 A1 20000726; EP 1021815 B1 20020123; JP 2001514434 A 20010911; TW 385465 B 20000321; US 6191671 B1 20010220; WO 9910907 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090724

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-01-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802921

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-14

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB