Global Patent Index - EP 1021852 A2

EP 1021852 A2 2000-07-26 - HF COAXIAL PLUG-IN CONNECTOR

Title (en)

HF COAXIAL PLUG-IN CONNECTOR

Title (de)

HF-KOAXIAL-STECKVERBINDER

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR ENFICHABLE COAXIAL HF

Publication

EP 1021852 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 97914089 A

Priority

DE 9700153 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9833243A2] The invention relates to an HF coaxial plug-in connector for transmitting high-frequency electromagnetic waves, comprising a housing (8, 9, 13, 14, 47), at least one internal contact (4, 6, 48), and an external contact arranged coaxially around the internal contact (4, 6, 48). The housing (8, 9, 13, 14, 47) is configured as an injection-moulded plastic part and has a wall area made of plastic and arranged coaxially around the internal contact (4, 6, 48). At least the inner wall facing the internal contact (4, 6, 48) is provided with a metallizing layer (30). Said plug-in connector is preferably designed as a multipolar connector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/40 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9833243A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9833243 A2 19980730; WO 9833243 A3 20011220; AT 205642 T 20010915; DE 59704625 D1 20011018; EP 1021852 A2 20000726; EP 1021852 B1 20010912

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170127

2017-01-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59704625

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS A.G.

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020128

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59704625 20011018

2001-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 205642 T 20010915

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/646 A

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990720

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE