Global Patent Index - EP 1021962 A2

EP 1021962 A2 2000-07-26 - Improved Trousers

Title (en)

Improved Trousers

Title (de)

Verbesserte Hosen

Title (fr)

Pantalon Perfectionné

Publication

EP 1021962 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200204 A

Priority

ES 9900155 U

Abstract (en)

These trousers display a strip of fabric (1) whose lower edge is found sewn to the waistband (21) of the trousers (2), by the interior side of it, and whose upper edge is finished off with an elastic waistband (11) with the purpose of encircling the body of the wearer and acting as an element of support for the pair of trousers (2). The strip (1) displays a length of noticeably the same length as the waistband (21) of the trousers (2) and a width greater than the height of said waistband (21) partially sticking out above it so as to imitate the upper portion of an item of underwear. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 1/06 (2006.01); A41F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 1/062 (2013.01); A41F 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1021962 A2 20000726; EP 1021962 A3 20000823; BR 8000246 U 20010403; ES 1041748 U 19990716; ES 1041748 Y 19991216; JP 3070436 U 20000804

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020704

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 41D 1/00 A, 7A 41D 1/06 B, 7A 41F 9/02 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI