Global Patent Index - EP 1021968 A1

EP 1021968 A1 2000-07-26 - Retractable anti-skid device

Title (en)

Retractable anti-skid device

Title (de)

Einziehbare Gleitschutzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif antidérapant rétractable

Publication

EP 1021968 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410003 A

Priority

  • FR 9900663 A
  • FR 9908274 A

Abstract (en)

The anti-slip device consists of a teethed crown (7) which rotates on a pivot inside a heel (6) made in two separate halves. The crown has a threaded outer surface that engages with an inner threaded surface of a knurled wheel (4), the outer edge of which projects from the front or one side of the heel. When the wheel is rotated in one direction the teeth of the crown are deployed from ythe surface of the heel to provide a grip, and when the wheel is rotated in the other direction the crown is retracted inside the heel.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif est antidérapant retractable, il permet à des semelles de chaussures spécialement aménagées, de l'incorporer, afin de ne pas déraper sur des sols devenus glissants (verglas, hydrocarbures) ou les sols de cuisines, restaurants, cantines, rendus glissants aux moments des lavages journaliers. Ce dispositif antidérapant pour chaussures traditionnelles ou sportives est caractérisé en ce qu'il est incorporé dans un talon de chaussures aménagé en 2 demies parties (1)- (3), et en ce qu' il comporte un axe (17), intégré dans la demie partie supérieure (1) du talon et une couronne (2), muni d'un patin "antiderapant", puis, une molette (4) avec un pas de vis, ainsi que plusieurs espaces adaptés, dans la demie partie supérieure (1) et inférieure (3) du talon afin que les dits éléments puissent se mouvoir, et en ce que la couronne (2) est munie de dents (7) sur sa partie inférieure et d'un filetage (13) sur son côté extérieur qui lui permet d' évoluer verticalement, grâce à la molette (4) munie du pas de vis (14) hélicoïdal dans son intérieur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 15/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1021968 A1 20000726; FR 2788413 A1 20000721; FR 2788413 B1 20010309

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021015

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI