Global Patent Index - EP 1021981 A2

EP 1021981 A2 2000-07-26 - Handle for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Handle for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Handgriff für ein verfahrbares Sauggerät

Title (fr)

Poignée pour aspirateur

Publication

EP 1021981 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124625 A

Priority

DE 29900462 U

Abstract (en)

The handle is mounted in or on the rear wall of the vacuum cleaner (1) near two fixed wheels (14) and has at least two telescopically coupled and latchable rods (5). The rods can be deployed vertically upwards and have an upper part with a grip (3) at the upper free end. The handle grip is inclined forward at a known angle. When the cleaner is not tilted the handle grip lies approximately in a vertical projection above the axes of the fixed wheels and in the same plane when extracted or retracted

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Handgriff für ein verfahrbares Sauggerät, wobei ein Handgriff in oder an der Gehäuserückwand in der Nähe der starren Räder angebracht ist und mindestens zwei zueinander veschiebliche und verrastbare Teleskopstangen mit oben angebrachter Handhabe enthält und der Handgriff über eine oder mehrere Führungsbuchsen am Sauggerät befestigt ist, welche Führungsbuchsen an einer gehäuseartigen Halterung festliegen. Der obere Teil des Handgriffes ist an seinem freien Ende bevorzugt um einen gewissen Winkel nach vorn in Richtung der Gerätemitte abgekröpft ist. Eine andere Ausgestaltung der Erfindung sieht zwei voneinander beabstandete Teleskopstangen-Systeme mit jeweils mindestens zwei Teleskopstangen an der Gehäuserückwand vor, wobei die beiden Teleskopstangen-Systeme mit einer bügelförmigen Handhabe verbunden sind. Vorteil der Erfindung ist, daß durch die Anordnung des Handgriffes an der Rückwand des Gehäuses der Benutzer bequem, ohne sich beugen zu müssen, die Handhabe des Handgriffes ergreifen und bis in die gewünschte Höhe herausziehen kann, so daß der Benutzer im wesentlichen in aufrechter Körperhaltung das verfahrbare Sauggerät an der Handhabe des Handgriffes transportieren kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/327 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900462 U1 20000302; EP 1021981 A2 20000726; EP 1021981 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040608

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK GB

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI