Global Patent Index - EP 1021981 A3

EP 1021981 A3 2000-11-15 - Handle for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Handle for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Handgriff für ein verfahrbares Sauggerät

Title (fr)

Poignée pour aspirateur

Publication

EP 1021981 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124625 A

Priority

DE 29900462 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1021981A2] The handle is mounted in or on the rear wall of the vacuum cleaner (1) near two fixed wheels (14) and has at least two telescopically coupled and latchable rods (5). The rods can be deployed vertically upwards and have an upper part with a grip (3) at the upper free end. The handle grip is inclined forward at a known angle. When the cleaner is not tilted the handle grip lies approximately in a vertical projection above the axes of the fixed wheels and in the same plane when extracted or retracted

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/327 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900462 U1 20000302; EP 1021981 A2 20000726; EP 1021981 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040608

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK GB

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI