Global Patent Index - EP 1022010 A1

EP 1022010 A1 2000-07-26 - MOBILE MORGUE

Title (en)

MOBILE MORGUE

Title (de)

MOBILES LEICHENSCHAUHAUS

Title (fr)

MORGUE MOBILE

Publication

EP 1022010 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911822 A

Priority

  • ES 9900092 W
  • ES 9800880 A

Abstract (en)

Mobile morgue comprising a trailer which is closed by means of its body and having major extensible sides; the inside of the trailer which forms a mobile unit is divided into three compartments; a cooled compartment at one extremity which is independent from the other two compartments and having an external side access door; the coffin is placed in said cooled compartment and is visible through an extremity internal window; the other two compartments define the area where the body has opposite extensible sides; one of said two compartments forms an extremity of the mobile unit and can be accessed by the rear end of the unit through a staircase and a ramp which can both rotate in this structure or frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 21/00; B60P 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 21/00 (2006.01); B60P 3/025 (2006.01); B60P 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 21/00 (2013.01); B60P 3/025 (2013.01); B60P 3/0252 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955279A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CY GR IE MC NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777843 A1 19991029; AR 027483 A4 20030402; AT A900399 A 20030215; AU 3036599 A 19991116; AU 750703 B2 20020725; BG 103973 A 20000731; BG 63798 B1 20030131; BR 9906364 A 20000919; CA 2294087 A1 19991104; CN 1266363 A 20000913; CU 22712 A3 20011011; CZ 297048 B6 20060816; CZ 9904654 A3 20000412; DE 19981104 T1 20001012; DK 184199 A 19991222; EP 1022010 A1 20000726; ES 2144952 A1 20000616; ES 2144952 B1 20010101; GB 2342900 A 20000426; GB 2342900 B 20011121; GB 9930211 D0 20000209; HR P990406 A2 20000430; HU 0002487 A2 20001228; HU 0002487 A3 20020328; HU 222478 B1 20030728; IT 1313505 B1 20020724; IT TO980860 A1 19991025; LU 90489 A1 20000510; MX PA99011823 A 20020702; PA 8488901 A1 20010731; PL 196140 B1 20071231; PL 337364 A1 20000814; PT 102179 A 19991029; PT 102179 B 20031128; RO 119580 B1 20050128; SE 9904703 D0 19991221; SE 9904703 L 19991221; SI 20188 A 20001031; SK 177999 A3 20000711; US 6299229 B1 20011009; WO 9955279 A1 19991104; YU 69599 A 20010528

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081220

2002-12-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001021

2001-04-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CY GR IE MC NL

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CY GR IE MC NL