Global Patent Index - EP 1022011 A1

EP 1022011 A1 2000-07-26 - Nozzle fitting for spa baths

Title (en)

Nozzle fitting for spa baths

Title (de)

Düsenarmatur für Wannen oder Becken für Sprudelbäder

Title (fr)

Armature de buse pour baignoire à tourbillonnement

Publication

EP 1022011 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99890014 A

Priority

EP 99890014 A

Abstract (en)

The nozzle fitting for bubble-baths has air and water inlets (5,6) and a nozzle cap (4) containing at least one nozzle opening (14) for water and at least one nozzle opening (15) for air. The water jet emerging from the water-nozzle opening is directed at the air current emerging from the air-nozzle opening. A housing contains a hollow cylindrical nozzle body (2) whose wall contains air inlet holes (8). The hollow cylindrical distributor (3) inside the nozzle body forms an annular duct (11) whose external diameter is smaller than the internal diameter of the nozzle body. The nozzle body and distributor are closed by the cap.

Abstract (de)

Eine Düsenarmatur für Wannen oder Becken für Sprudelbäder weist eine Luft- und eine Wasserzuführungsleitung (5, 6) und eine Düsenkappe (4) auf, in der zumindest eine Düsenöffnung (14) für Wasser und zumindest eine Düsenöffnung (15) für Luft vorgesehen ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist der aus der Düsenöffnung (14) für Wasser austretende Wasserstrahl auf den aus der Düsenöffnung (15) für Luft austretenden Luftstrom gerichtet. Dadurch wird der Luftstrom in unzählige, sehr kleine Blasen zerteilt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/027 (2013.01); A61H 33/026 (2013.01); A61H 33/6021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022011 A1 20000726; EP 1022011 B1 20041110; DE 59911041 D1 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KOLLER RUDOLF

- Effective date: 20050131

2007-07-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-01-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRANZ KALDEWEI GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KOLLER, RUDOLF

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-02-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-02-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050210

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050122

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911041 P 20041216

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL

2004-11-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-11-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030116

2001-05-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI