Global patent index - EP 1022061 A2

EP 1022061 A2 2000-07-26 - Dispensing multiple-component flowable substances

Title (en)

Dispensing multiple-component flowable substances

Title (de)

Abgabe von flüssigen Mehrkomponenten-Substanzen

Title (fr)

Distribution de substances liquides à plusieurs composants

Publication

EP 1022061 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300015 A

Priority

US 23614299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022060A2] There is disclosed a sprayer apparatus for selectively spraying or dispensing multiple fluid components. The apparatus comprises a housing having a first inlet and a first outlet, the first housing inlet being adapted for attachment to a garden hose, the first housing outlet being in fluid communication with the first housing inlet; and an insert member having a first inlet for receiving fluid and a first outlet for dispensing fluid therefrom, the first insert inlet being in fluid communication with the first insert outlet through a passage defined by the insert member, the insert member being mateable with the housing so that the first housing outlet mates with the first insert inlet so that a fluid can flow from the first housing inlet to the first insert outlet. A method of spraying a fluid is also disclosed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/24; B05B 12/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/24 (2006.01); B05B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/2472 (2013.01); B05B 7/2443 (2013.01); B05B 1/267 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022060 A2 20000726; EP 1022060 A3 20020123; EP 1022060 B1 20100324; AT 461751 T 20100415; AU 1248900 A 20000727; BR 0000887 A 20001017; CA 2296215 A1 20000722; CA 2296215 C 20100330; DE 60044044 D1 20100506; DK 1022060 T3 20100621; EP 1022061 A2 20000726; EP 1022061 A3 20011121; US 6283385 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status

2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI