Global patent index - EP 1022062 A1

EP 1022062 A1 2000-07-26 - Packaging and dispensing arrangement with a pump and a flexible container

Title (en)

Packaging and dispensing arrangement with a pump and a flexible container

Title (de)

Mit einer Pumpe und einem flexiblen Behälter versehene Verpackungs- und Spendeanordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de conditionnement et de distribution d'un produit équipé d'une pompe et d'un réservoir souple

Publication

EP 1022062 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400033 A

Priority

FR 9900579 A

Abstract (en)

Container and dispenser comprises a supple reservoir (2) for the product, a pump (26) and an outlet (38), and an outer elastomer container (4), e.g. of oval cross-section, with walls of varying thickness. The container can be squeezed in the hand to compress the inner reservoir, returning to its original shape when the pressure is released. Container and dispenser comprises a supple reservoir (2) for the product, a pump (26) and an outlet (38), and an outer elastomer container (4), e.g. of oval cross-section, with walls of varying thickness. The container can be squeezed in the hand to compress the inner reservoir, returning to its original shape when the pressure is released. The thickness of its walls varies in a plane perpendicular to or in line with its lengthwise axis, creating zones subject to greater deformation when squeezed.

Abstract (fr)

Ensemble de conditionnement et de distribution (1) d'un produit (P) comprenant : a) un réservoir (2) à parois souples, aptes à se contracter sur elles-mêmes en réponse à une dépression à l'intérieur du réservoir, b) une pompe (26) montée sur ledit réservoir et apte, en réponse à une commande d'actionnement, à distribuer ledit produit au travers d'un orifice de sortie (38), ledit réservoir étant disposé à l'intérieur d'une enceinte extérieure (4) dont les parois ont une épaisseur suffisante pour assurer une stabilité de forme audit ensemble, lesdites parois étant réalisées en un matériau élastomérique de manière à pouvoir se déformer de façon réversible, en réponse à une pression résultant de la prise en main par l'utilisateur dudit ensemble. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00; B65D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/00 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01); B65D 83/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/0043 (2013.01); B65D 1/0207 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022062 A1 20000726; FR 2788500 A1 20000721; FR 2788500 B1 20010302; JP 2000229682 A 20000822; JP 3406264 B2 20030512

INPADOC legal status

2007-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060823

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI