Global patent index - EP 1022070 A2

EP 1022070 A2 2000-07-26 - Mandrel, apparatus and method for the cold drawing of seamless tubes

Title (en)

Mandrel, apparatus and method for the cold drawing of seamless tubes

Title (de)

Dorn, Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Kaltziehen nahtloser Rohre

Title (fr)

Mandrin, dispositif et procédé d'étirage à froid de tuyaux sans soudure

Publication

EP 1022070 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100800 A

Priority

DE 19902501 A

Abstract (en)

The cold drawing device is used in conjunction with a mandrel (1), which has a mandrel guide with a guide arm (4) fitted against the drawing direction. The device (5) is pressed against the inner wall of the tube (3). It has a flatter (2) and a tube guide (6). The tube is guided to a point going out from the flatter against the direction of drawing.

Abstract (de)

Um beim Kaltziehen nahtloser Rohre, die Gefahr einer Exzentrizität mit einfachen Mitteln zu reduzieren, wird ein Dorn mit einer entgegen der Ziehrichtung angeordneten Dornführung vorgeschlagen. Desweiteren wird vorgeschlagen, daß ein Ziehstein und ein mit dem Ziehstein zusammenwirkender Dorn in Abhängigkeit von der Exzentrizität des Rohres in ihrem Relativwinkel zueinander verändert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 3/16; B21C 1/24; B21C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/24 (2006.01); B21C 3/14 (2006.01); B21C 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/24 (2013.01); B21C 3/14 (2013.01); B21C 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022070 A2 20000726; EP 1022070 A3 20020102; DE 19902501 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040211

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE IT

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI