Global Patent Index - EP 1022071 A4

EP 1022071 A4 2000-10-18 - STRIP PLATE WINDING-UP DEVICE

Title (en)

STRIP PLATE WINDING-UP DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFWICKELN VON METALLBAND

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE BOBINAGE DE BANDE METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 1022071 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98955928 A

Priority

  • JP 9805309 W
  • JP 32567897 A
  • JP 35913997 A
  • JP 531598 A
  • JP 1651098 A
  • JP 10900298 A
  • JP 19078198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022071A1] The present invention aims to provide a band plate winding system capable of high speed winding at a low cost. The band plate winding system comprises a carrousel type winder (5) having a plurality of individually driven mandrels (7) on a circular support frame (6) provided so as to be rotationally drivable in a vertical plane, and a roll type wrapping device (10) for supporting a plurality of unit rolls (22a to 22d) each provided so as to be movable forward and backward between a position surrounding the mandrel located at a winding start position of the winder (5) and a retreat position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/00 (2006.01); B21C 47/06 (2006.01); B21C 47/24 (2006.01); B65H 18/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/28 (2006.01); B65H 19/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/063 (2013.01); B21C 47/245 (2013.01); B21C 47/34 (2013.01); B21C 47/3441 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] EP 0897765 A1 19990224 - KVAERNER TECH & RES LTD [GB]
  • [Y] JP S4845758 A 19730629
  • [A] US 2526010 A 19501017 - EDSTROM ERIC H
  • [XAY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 218 (M - 503) 30 July 1986 (1986-07-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 002 (M - 266) 7 January 1984 (1984-01-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 170 (M - 817) 21 April 1989 (1989-04-21)
  • See also references of WO 9928062A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022071 A1 20000726; EP 1022071 A4 20001018; EP 1022071 B1 20030813; BR 9806803 A 20000502; CA 2271461 A1 19990527; CA 2271461 C 20031230; CN 1139446 C 20040225; CN 1244145 A 20000209; CN 1244416 C 20060308; CN 1247337 C 20060329; CN 1247338 C 20060329; CN 1248797 C 20060405; CN 1494959 A 20040512; CN 1494960 A 20040512; CN 1494961 A 20040512; CN 1494962 A 20040512; DE 69817205 D1 20030918; DE 69817205 T2 20040617; DE 69838112 D1 20070830; DE 69838112 T2 20080410; EP 1384533 A2 20040128; EP 1384533 A3 20041229; EP 1384533 B1 20070718; EP 1398090 A2 20040317; EP 1398090 A3 20091230; EP 1398090 B1 20140115; EP 1398091 A2 20040317; EP 1398091 A3 20091230; EP 1398092 A2 20040317; EP 1398092 A3 20091230; EP 1398092 B1 20120815; JP 3621709 B2 20050216; KR 100377292 B1 20030326; KR 100377293 B1 20030326; KR 100377294 B1 20030326; KR 100377295 B1 20030326; KR 100377452 B1 20030328; US 2002130213 A1 20020919; US 6488227 B1 20021203; US 6585187 B2 20030701; WO 9928062 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2007-11-07 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070702

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051126

2006-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051126

2004-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041103

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SMS DEMAG AG

2004-06-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817205 P 20030918

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-10-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990602

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL