Global Patent Index - EP 1022095 A2

EP 1022095 A2 2000-07-26 - Clamping device, especially multiple clamping device

Title (en)

Clamping device, especially multiple clamping device

Title (de)

Spanneinrichtung, insbesondere Mehrfachspanneinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage, notamment dispositif de serrage multiple

Publication

EP 1022095 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100536 A

Priority

DE 19902568 A

Abstract (en)

The clamping device has a base element (6) fixed in various positions and movably held on the base rail (2). The base element has a clamping element for clamping a workpiece (24) against a further clamping (4) or thrust (3) module on the base rail. The clamping element is screwed onto the base element, and has a leading slope (10) cooperating with a counter-surface (12) when the screw is tightened. A control element (11) movable towards the base rail when the screw is tightened is movably positioned on the base element in the screw's axial direction especially. A clamping-jaw element (9) is parallel with the base rail and movably positioned on the base element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Spanneinrichtung, insbesondere Mehrfachspanneinrichtung mit wenigstens einem an einer Basisschiene (2) angeordneten Spannmodul (4), das ein verschiebbar an der Basisschiene (2) gehaltenes und in unterschiedlichen Positionen an dieser fixierbares Grundelement (6) und ein Spannelement, das an dem Grundelement (6) zum Spannen eines Werkstücks (24) gegen ein weiteres an der Basisschiene (2) vorgesehenes Spannmodul (4) oder Anschlagmodul (3) verschiebbar angeordnet ist, aufweist, wobei das Spannelement an dem Grundelement (6) durch eine Schraube (8) gehalten ist und eine Auflaufschräge (10) aufweist, die beim Festziehen der Schraube (8) mit einer Gegenfläche (12) zusammenwirkt, um die Bewegung der Schraube (8) in eine Spannbewegung des Spannelements umzusetzen, welche dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß das Spannelement ein quer zur Führungsrichtung des Spannmoduls (4) und insbesondere in Axialrichtung der Schraube (8) verschiebbar am Grundelement (6) angeordnetes Betätigungselement (11), das durch Festziehen der Schraube (8) in Richtung der Basisschiene (2) bewegbar ist, und ein parallel zur Basisschiene (2) am Grundelement (6) bewegbar angeordnetes Spannbackenelement (9) aufweist, wobei am Betätigungselement (11) und am Spannbackenelement (9) Auflaufschrägen (10, 12) ausgebildet sind, die miteinander zusammenwirken, um bei einem Festziehen der Schraube (8) die Bewegung des Betätigungselements (11) in eine Bewegung des Spannbackenelements (9) umzusetzen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/08 (2006.01); B25B 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/08 (2013.01); B25B 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022095 A2 20000726; EP 1022095 A3 20021023; DE 19902568 A1 20000810; DE 19902568 C2 20030508

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25B 5/08 A, 7B 23Q 3/06 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI