Global Patent Index - EP 1022123 A2

EP 1022123 A2 2000-07-26 - Process and device for production of cushioning material and the cushioning material so produced

Title (en)

Process and device for production of cushioning material and the cushioning material so produced

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Polstermaterial sowie Polstermaterial

Title (fr)

Procedé et dispositif pour la fabrication de matériaux de rembourrage et matériaux ainsi produits

Publication

EP 1022123 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101066 A

Priority

  • DE 19902227 A
  • DE 19911628 A

Abstract (en)

The method is carried out in steps: The flat material is partly cut through in such a manner, that transversely lying adjacent strip sections in the region of connecting sections spaced at a distance to each other longitudinally, remain connected with each other. The strip sections (65,66) are deformed between connecting sections (67) at right angles to a neutral surface of the flat material in such a way. The strip sections adjacent transversely (69), are deflected in opposing directions.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polstermaterial aus Karton o. dgl. beschrieben. Dabei wird der Karton in parallele Streifenabschnitte zerschnitten, die im Bereich von in Längsrichtung der Streifen beabstandete Verbindungsbereichen teilweise miteinander verbunden bleiben. Zwischen den Verbindungsbereichen werden die Streifenabschnitte senkrecht zur Kartonausdehnung so verformt, daß in Querrichtung benachbarte Streifenabschnitte in entgegengesetzten Richtungen verbogen werden. Eine bevorzugte Herstellungsvorrichtung ist nach Art eines Dokumentenvernichters mit einem Schneidwerk mit zusammenwirkenden Schneidwalzen ausgebildet, wobei die Schneidwalzen Umfangsnuten haben, die bei Durchlauf des Kartons in regelmäßigen Abständen zu einer Schnittunterbrechung führen. Zum Betreiben des Antriebs-Elektromotors kann ein einphasiger Wechselstrom über einen Gleichrichter und einen Wechselrichter in einen Drehstrom beliebiger Art umgewandelt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31D 5/0065 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0082 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0088 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022123 A2 20000726; EP 1022123 A3 20020529; EP 1022123 B1 20050504; AT 294698 T 20050515; CN 100398311 C 20080702; CN 1268473 A 20001004; ES 2243150 T3 20051201; US 6419867 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150121

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150121

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150120

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150120

2015-09-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50010197

2015-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-11-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 294698 T

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MARTIN YALE INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Free text: MARTIN YALE INTERNATIONAL GMBH#BERGHEIMER STRASSE 6-12#88677 MARKDORF/BODENSEE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MARTIN YALE INTERNATIONAL GMBH#BERGHEIMER STRASSE 6-12#88677 MARKDORF/BODENSEE (DE)

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050504

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHLEICHER & CO. INTERNATIONAL A.G.

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243150 T3

2005-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MARTIN YALE INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MARTIN YALE INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-10-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-09-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050812

2005-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2005-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MARTIN YALE INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Free text: SCHLEICHER & CO. INTERNATIONAL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#BERGHEIMER STRASSE 6-12#D-88677 MARKDORF/BODENSEE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MARTIN YALE INTERNATIONAL GMBH#BERGHEIMER STRASSE 6-12#88677 MARKDORF/BODENSEE (DE)

2005-08-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MARTIN YALE INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2005-08-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-08-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010197 P 20050609

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-04-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCTION OF CUSHIONING MATERIAL AND THE CUSHIONING MATERIAL SO PRODUCED

2004-12-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCTION OF CUSHIONING MATERIAL AND THE CUSHIONING MATERIAL SO PRODUCED

2003-10-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CLAIMS 1-16 CONCERN A MACHINE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING INFLATABLE CUSHIONS COMPRISING ELECTRICAL CONTACTS AND ADJUSTA

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020928

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI