Global patent index - EP 1022136 A2

EP 1022136 A2 2000-07-26 - Device for conditioning a paper web

Title (en)

Device for conditioning a paper web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Konditionieren einer Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'une bande de papier

Publication

EP 1022136 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100099 A

Priority

DE 19901801 A

Abstract (en)

The system is designed so that the cooling off zones (5) of the drier (1) contains a moistening unit (8), serving for remoistening and cooling of the paper web (2). The spray nozzles (10) of which is suppliable with an amount of liquid exceeding the remoistening liquid amount.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Konditionieren einer vorzugsweise frisch bedruckten Papierbahn (2) mit einem Trockner (1) und einer Rückbefeuchtungseinrichtung, wobei der Trockner (1) eine Aufheizzone (3), Temperaturhaltezone (4) und Abkühlzone (5) und die Rückbefeuchtungseinrichtung oberhalb und unterhalb der Transportebene der Papierbahn (2) angeordnete, mit Befeuchtungsmittel beaufschlagbare Sprühdüsen (10) und diese aufnehmende Sprühkammern (9) aufweisen, werden dadurch eine besonders kompakte Bauweise erreicht, dass die Abkühlzone (5) des Trockners (1) eine zur Rückbefeuchtung und Kühlung der Papierbahn (2) dienende Befeuchtungseinrichtung (8) enthält. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/02 (2006.01); B41F 23/04 (2006.01); B41L 23/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/0483 (2013.01); B41F 23/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022136 A2 20000726; EP 1022136 A3 20020515; EP 1022136 B1 20050914; CN 1261027 A 20000726; DE 19901801 A1 20000727; DE 19901801 C2 20031211; DE 50011142 D1 20051020; JP 2000211111 A 20000802; US 6223448 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071207

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061207

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-04-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-12-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011142

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-10-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALDWIN GERMANY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41F 23/02 A, 7B 41F 23/04 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI