Global Patent Index - EP 1022140 A1

EP 1022140 A1 2000-07-26 - Inkjet printhead

Title (en)

Inkjet printhead

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldruckkopf

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1022140 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00200125 A

Priority

  • EP 00200125 A
  • EP 99200195 A

Abstract (en)

Ink jet printhead comprising a channel plate (12) having a plurality of ink channels (14) etched into at least one surface thereof, actuators (22) respectively associated with each of the ink channels for pressurizing ink contained in the ink channels, and means (10) defining an ink reservoir (32) communicating with the ink channels, wherein that said ink reservoir defining means are formed by a base member (10) made of a material different from that of the channel late (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14274 (2013.01); B41J 2/14233 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0671372 A2 19950913 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022140 A1 20000726; EP 1022140 B1 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170114

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2017-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170114

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60002109 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI