Global Patent Index - EP 1022154 A3

EP 1022154 A3 2001-03-07 - Bookmark

Title (en)

Bookmark

Title (de)

Lesezeichnen

Title (fr)

Signet

Publication

EP 1022154 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00101045 A

Priority

IT GE990001 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022154A2] A bookmark comprises a sheet (1) made of flexible material. The said sheet (1) presents means (101) for releasable coupling to the perimetral edge (23) of one page (21) of a volume of sheets (20). Indicator means (201, 301, 401, 501) are provided for indicating one or more lines of characters printed on said page (21) and guiding means (111) are provided for its sliding along the edge of the said page. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 9/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022154 A2 20000726; EP 1022154 A3 20010307; IT 248382 Y1 20030128; IT GE990001 U1 20000724

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI