Global Patent Index - EP 1022225 A1

EP 1022225 A1 2000-07-26 - Package for displaying and selling small and medium-sized loose articles

Title (en)

Package for displaying and selling small and medium-sized loose articles

Title (de)

Verpackung zur Schaustellung und zum Verkauf von losen Gegenständen kleiner und mittlerer Grösse

Title (fr)

Emballage destiné au conditionnement, en vue de leur exposition à la vente, d'articles de petites et moyennes dimensions vendus en vrac

Publication

EP 1022225 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440010 A

Priority

EP 99440010 A

Abstract (en)

The package consists of a transparent plastic sachet (1) to contain the displayed articles, attached to a card (2) with information about the articles and a hole (20) by which the package can be suspended from a display hook. The card is made from a semi-rigid plastic, and the sachet is attached to it by a clip (3) made as part of the card and designed to retain the sachet's open upper edge. The clip can be made, for example, in the form of two hinged strips (30, 31), engaging by a tongue and groove (33) to trap the sachet edge. In variants the clip can be in the form of a separate rod pressed into a moulded recess in the card or a moulded projection and recess on two halves of a folded card.

Abstract (fr)

Emballage destiné au conditionnement, en vue de leur exposition à la vente, d'articles de petites et moyennes dimensions vendus en vrac, du type comprenant un sachet (1) en matière plastique transparente associé à une carte informative (2). La carte informative (2) est solidarisée au sachet (1) par un moyen d'encliquetage (3) que comporte la carte informative (2), apte à emprisonner par pincement, de manière réversible, le sachet (1) sur son bord (10) qui présente une ouverture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/14; B65D 33/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/14 (2006.01); B65D 33/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/1658 (2013.01); B65D 33/14 (2013.01); B65D 2203/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2678908 A1 19930115 - VYNEX SA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022225 A1 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020429

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-06-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI