Global Patent Index - EP 1022230 A1

EP 1022230 A1 2000-07-26 - Container closure provided with applicator

Title (en)

Container closure provided with applicator

Title (de)

Behälterverschluss mit Auftragelement

Title (fr)

Fermeture de récipient pourvu d'un applicateur

Publication

EP 1022230 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123406 A

Priority

DE 19901805 A

Abstract (en)

A wiper element(7) is provided inside the container's withdrawal hole defined by the encompassing wall(2) of the bottom section(1) of the top. The wiper element may be formed by as a rib extending radially inwards from the inner side of the wall, or as a rib running round the wall in partially circular fashion. The rib may have a flat rectangular cross section and lying in a plane perpendicular to an axis(15) of the top. The wiper element may have the form of a section of a truncated cone surface.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Behälterverschluß, bestehend aus einem mit dem Rand einer Behälteröffnung verbindbaren Verschlußunterteil (1), welches eine umlaufende Wand (2) aufweist, die eine Entnahmeöffnung (3) definiert, die durch eine auf das Verschlußunterteil (1) aufsetzbare Verschlußkappe (4) verschließbar ist, wobei die Verschlußkappe (4) ihrerseits eine umlaufende Kappenwand (5) und eine Stirn (6) aufweist, an deren Innenseite ein Auftragelement (8) angebracht ist, welches bei auf das Verschlußunterteil (1) aufgesetzte Verschlußkappe (4) durch die durch das Verschlußunterteil (1) gebildete Entnahmeöffnung (3) hindurchragt. Um einen Behälterverschluß mit den eingangs genannten Merkmalen zu schaffen, der ein besseres Dosieren des an dem Auftragelement haftenden Produktes ermöglicht, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß innerhalb der durch die umlaufende Wand (2) des Verschlußunterteils (1) definierten Entnahmeöffnung (3) ein Abstreifelement (7) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19901805 A1 20000720; EP 1022230 A1 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI