Global Patent Index - EP 1022347 A1

EP 1022347 A1 2000-07-26 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING RAW PLATE FOR SURFACE TREATMENT PLATE FOR CAN USING CONTINUOUS ANNEALING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING RAW PLATE FOR SURFACE TREATMENT PLATE FOR CAN USING CONTINUOUS ANNEALING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ROHPLATTE ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG EINER DOSE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON DURCHLAUFGLÜHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PLAQUE BRUTE POUR PLAQUE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE DESTINEE A UNE CONSERVE AU MOYEN D'UNE RECUISSON CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1022347 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99926832 A

Priority

  • JP 9903471 W
  • JP 21039498 A

Abstract (en)

The method for manufacturing a blackplatet for tinplate and tin-free steel by continuous annealing, comprises the steps of: heating and soaking an as cold rolled steel sheet of low carbon aluminum-killed steel containing not more than 0.1% by weight C and 0.001 to 0.015% by weight N, to temperatures of not less than recrystallization point; applying a first cooling to thus heated and soaked steel sheet to temperatures of from 350 to 480 DEG C at average cooling speeds of from more than 100 DEG C/sec to less than 300 DEG C/sec; applying overaging to thus cooled steel sheet without giving reheating thereto; applying final cooling to thus overaged steel sheet to conduct temper rolling; wherein the temperatures for soaking at not less than recrystallization point are varied depending on aimed temper degree, thus keeping a heat cycle in stages succeeding to the first cooling nearly unchanged independent of the temper degree. With the method, it is possible to manufacture blackplates having different temper degrees separately and stably at a low cost covering all ranges of from soft materials to hard materials without degrading productivity and yield using a compact and inexpensive single CAL facility.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/46; C22C 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C21D 9/52 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/52 (2013.01); C21D 8/0273 (2013.01); C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/004 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022347 A1 20000726; EP 1022347 A4 20040506; CN 1101857 C 20030219; CN 1273612 A 20001115; JP 2000026921 A 20000125; TR 200000567 T1 20010723; WO 0003043 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050107

2004-05-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-02-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE