Global Patent Index - EP 1022357 A1

EP 1022357 A1 2000-07-26 - Surface treatment process for stainless steels

Title (en)

Surface treatment process for stainless steels

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Oberflächenbehandlung von rostfreien Stählen

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de surfaces d'aciers inoxydables

Publication

EP 1022357 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101186 A

Priority

ES 9900126 A

Abstract (en)

Process for treating rust-free steels comprises oxidizing the steel surface and then removing the oxide layer.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung von rostfreien Stählen, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß es die folgenden Schritte umfaßt: a) Oxidation der Stahloberfläche und b) Entfernen der Oxidschicht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 15/00; C23G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 15/00 (2006.01); C23G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23G 1/08 (2013.01); C23F 15/00 (2013.01); C23G 1/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5269957 A 19931214 - IKEDA MIKIO [JP], et al
  • [X] US 4078949 A 19780314 - BOGGS WILLIAM E, et al
  • [A] WO 9836044 A1 19980820 - CROWN TECHNOLOGY INC [US]
  • [A] LU 64876 A1 19720706 - CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE [BE]
  • [XY] VOLLMER T. ; GUEMPEL P. ; BLAISE M. ; RACKY W.: "Oberflächenbehandlungsverfahren und deren Einfluss auf die Korrosionsbeständigkeit nichrostender Stähle", WERKSTOFFE UND KORROSION., vol. 46, no. 2, February 1995 (1995-02-01), VERLAG CHEMIE GMBM. WEINHEIM., DE, pages 92 - 96, XP002136840, ISSN: 0947-5117
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 344 (M - 640) 11 November 1987 (1987-11-11)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 02 29 February 1996 (1996-02-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022357 A1 20000726; EP 1022357 B1 20040630; AT 270353 T 20040715; DE 50006912 D1 20040805; ES 2162546 A1 20011216; ES 2162546 B1 20030501; ES 2223321 T3 20050301

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERATE G.M.B.H. *BSH

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERATE G.M.B.H. *BSH

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2223321 T3

2005-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-01-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040809

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006912 P 20040805

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH FABRICACION, S.A.

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH FABRICACION, S.A.

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020821

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CASTANEDO, ANGEL RODRIGUEZ

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SALOMON, JUERGEN

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDMAYER, GERHARD

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WALTER, BERNHARD

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOERDENS, FRANK, DR.

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CASTANEDO, ANGEL RODRIGUEZ

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SALOMON, JUERGEN

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDMAYER, GERHARD

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WALTER, BERNHARD

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOERDENS, FRANK, DR.

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI