Global Patent Index - EP 1022361 A2

EP 1022361 A2 2000-07-26 - Process for cleaning metals after their thermal treatment

Title (en)

Process for cleaning metals after their thermal treatment

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Metallen nach deren Bearbeitung mit hohen Temperaturen

Title (fr)

Procédé de nettoyage de métaux après leur traitement thermique

Publication

EP 1022361 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125871 A

Priority

  • EP 96930346 A
  • IT MO950131 A
  • IT MO950156 A

Abstract (en)

The appts. includes a pad which is made of an insulating fabric, and is placed between the electrode (10) and the metal (8) to be cleaned. It also includes a low-voltage alternating current source (2) which is connected to the metal (7) by means of the other electrode. The pad taking the form of a tubular sock (12) or a strip with a thickness of more than 1 mm is impregnated with an acid solution (18). The pad is made of a polyether ether ketone fabric with improved insulating properties.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Metallen besteht aus einem Propfen (12, 34, 91) aus Isoliermaterial, der zwischen die Elektrode (10, 26, 46) mit Schnabelform (11, 52, 94) und das zu reinigende Metall (8) gebracht wird, sowie aus einer Wechselstromquelle (2) mit Niederspannung, die auch mit der anderen Elektrode an das Metall (7) angeschlossen ist; eine Pumpe versorgt den obengenannten Stopfen mit einer hochdichten und sehr aggressiven sauren Lösung; der Stopfen besteht aus einem relativ dicken Strumpf oder Band. Die Vorrichtung ist mit Schlitzen (36) ausgestattet, über die die bei der Bearbeitung entstehenden Gase und Dämpfe mittels eines Sauglüfters (40) abgesogen und anschließend zwecks Abscheidung durch einem Feuchtfilter (41) geleitet werden. Es sind verschiedene Schnabelformen vorgesehen, und es besteht die Möglichkeit, die Schnabelenden (28, 94, 98) auszuwechseln. Der Schnabel ist vorzugsweise mit Bohrungen ausgeführt, durch die die saure Lösung geleitet wird. Der Körper des Schnabels (97) und das auswechselbare Ende (94, 98) können mit einem Film (101, 100) aus Isoliermaterial beschichtet sein, der sie vor unerwünschten Kurzschlüssen schützt und der die elektrolytische Aktion an der Endfläche (102) des Schnabels konzentriert. Als Isoliermaterial für den Stopfen sollte vorzugsweise Gewebe oder Filz aus Polyetheretherketon gewählt werden. Die höchste Lebensdauer und die größten Arbeitsmengen lassen sich erreichen, indem ein Doppelschichtstopfen (92, 93) verwendet wird, dessen innere Schicht aus Gewebe (92) und dessen äußere Schicht aus Filz (93) besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25F 7/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C25F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25F 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9712081 A1 19970403; AT 197318 T 20001115; AT 331056 T 20060715; AU 6942996 A 19970417; CA 2232571 A1 19970403; CA 2232571 C 20061024; CN 1067121 C 20010613; CN 1197487 A 19981028; DE 59606100 D1 20001207; DE 59611360 D1 20060803; EP 0852629 A1 19980715; EP 0852629 B1 20001102; EP 1022361 A2 20000726; EP 1022361 A3 20001129; EP 1022361 B1 20060621; ES 2153126 T3 20010216; IT 1279857 B1 19971218; IT MO950131 A1 19970328; IT MO950131 D0 19950927; JP 3160603 B2 20010425; JP H11511512 A 19991005; US 5964990 A 19991012

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090827

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060827

2008-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060621

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EDK RESEARCH A.G.

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060827

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060621

2007-01-10 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-11-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061121

2006-10-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59611360 P 20060803

2006-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0852629 P

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2005-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050401

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000114

2000-07-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 852629

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE