Global Patent Index - EP 1022366 A2

EP 1022366 A2 2000-07-26 - Fluid processing method of yarn and compression fluid processing nozzle used therefor

Title (en)

Fluid processing method of yarn and compression fluid processing nozzle used therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Flüssigkeitsbehandlung von Garnen und Druckflüssigkeitsdüse dafür

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de fils par liquide et buse de compression par fluide pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1022366 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99104643 A

Priority

JP 4872999 A

Abstract (en)

A nozzle core is to process a supplied yarn by an introduced compression fluid and is provided rotatably. Preferably, there is provided drive means for rotating the nozzle core. Preferably, a housing is provided to the nozzle core and is rotated integrally with the nozzle core. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 1/08; D02G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02J 1/00 (2006.01); B05B 1/00 (2006.01); D01H 4/04 (2006.01); D02J 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02J 1/08 (2013.01); D01H 4/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022366 A2 20000726; EP 1022366 A3 20031126; EP 1022366 B1 20080813; DE 69939305 D1 20080925; JP 2000212848 A 20000802; JP 3684899 B2 20050817; KR 100345989 B1 20020724; KR 20000052351 A 20000825; TW 513495 B 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69939305

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2011-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2010-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: AIKI RIOTECH CORPORATION

- Free text: AIKI RIOTECH CORPORATION#NO. 39 INOKUCHIKOBANDO-CHO#INAZAWA AICHI 492-8162 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- AIKI RIOTECH CORPORATION#NO. 39 INOKUCHIKOBANDO-CHO#INAZAWA AICHI 492-8162 (JP)

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-07-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090514

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081124

2008-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG WINTERTHUR

2008-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69939305 P 20080925

2008-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2007-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIKI RIOTECH CORPORATION

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050414

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 02J 1/08 A

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 02G 1/16 B

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990309

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI