Global Patent Index - EP 1022368 A1

EP 1022368 A1 2000-07-26 - Control unit for auxiliary jets of a pneumatic weaving machine

Title (en)

Control unit for auxiliary jets of a pneumatic weaving machine

Title (de)

Steuerungsteinheit für die Stafettendüse einer Luftdüsenwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Unité de contrôle pour des soufflantes auxiliaires d'un métier à tisser pneumatique

Publication

EP 1022368 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00500010 A

Priority

CZ 21699 A

Abstract (en)

Control unit for auxiliary jets (10) of a pneumatic weaving machine comprising a batten (2) coupled with a main drive and having situated thereon a reed (3) with a direct pick channel (4) provided in said reed (3) and having an open side oriented towards a batten line (5), the auxiliary jets (10) being arranged on the weaving machine batten (2) adjustably in relation to the pick channel (4) and adapted to take up the beat-up position of the auxiliary jets (10) and the pick position of the auxiliary jets (10). The auxiliary jets (10) are coupled with an auxiliary drive (11) separated from the main shaft of the weaving machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/30 (2006.01); D03D 49/60 (2006.01); D03D 51/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/302 (2013.01); D03D 47/3006 (2013.01); D03D 49/60 (2013.01); D03D 51/005 (2013.01); D03D 51/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022368 A1 20000726; CZ 287210 B6 20001011; CZ 9900216 A3 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050801

2001-10-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2001-04-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI