Global Patent Index - EP 1022372 A3

EP 1022372 A3 2001-03-21 - Carrier for yarn bobbins

Title (en)

Carrier for yarn bobbins

Title (de)

Träger zur Aufnahme von Garnspulen

Title (fr)

Support pour bobines de fil textile

Publication

EP 1022372 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100625 A

Priority

DE 19902419 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022372A2] The carrier to hold yarn bobbins has no centering spindle. It has an intermediate base (3) fitted between two layers of yarn bobbins and a press unit (8) to press the bobbin layers and the intermediate layer (3) against the base (1). An upright post (2) is in the center in relation to the base (1). A number of upright posts (2) can be used, which are off-center at the carrier. The intermediate layer (3) is of an elastic material such as rubber, with recesses at the upper and/or lower sides for the insertion of the yarn bobbins (4). The intermediate layer (3) can have cam surfaces between the bobbin layer settings. The press unit (8) uses gravity, with a weight to bear against the upper layer of bobbins or the intermediate layer (3). It is at the center post (2) in a release fitting, which can be locked in place at an adjusted setting. The press unit (8) has a cover structure. The base (1) and/or the intermediate layer (3) are structured to apply holding pressures to the wound yarn on the bobbins and not the bobbin sleeves. At least one post is a threaded spindle for the press unit to be wound up and down without steps. The intermediate layer (3) and/or the press unit (8) can carry spaced projections at the under side to grip in the bobbin carriers, with a diameter slightly smaller than the diameter of the bobbin carriers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/16 (2006.01); D06B 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/16 (2013.01); D06B 23/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022372 A2 20000726; EP 1022372 A3 20010321; DE 19902419 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI