Global Patent Index - EP 1022373 A3

EP 1022373 A3 2000-10-18 - Air-exhaust type clothes tumble drier

Title (en)

Air-exhaust type clothes tumble drier

Title (de)

Wäschetrommeltrockner mit Abluft

Title (fr)

Sèche-linge à tambour avec évacuation de l'air

Publication

EP 1022373 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99122974 A

Priority

IT PN990001 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022373A2] Clothes drier comprising, within an outer casing (1), a rotating drum (6) adapted to be loaded with the clothes and any other possible items to be dried, means (11) for heating, means (10, 12) for forcing the air to flow through the drum (6), means (15) for exhausting the air from the drier upon said air having become saturated, inside the drum (6), with the moisture contained in the clothes being dried. The present invention calls for filtering means (22), adapted to retain impurities carried by or anyway contained in the air taken in from the environment of the room where the appliance is installed, to be inserted along the flow-path (10) comprised between the air intake zone (21) of the appliance and the zone (13) at which said air enters the drum (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022373 A2 20000726; EP 1022373 A3 20001018; EP 1022373 B1 20040331; DE 69916006 D1 20040506; DE 69916006 T2 20041028; ES 2215356 T3 20041001; IT 248008 Y1 20021209; IT PN990001 U1 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916006

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131120

2015-03-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150331

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215356 T3

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916006 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS ITALY S.P.A.

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021206

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI