Global Patent Index - EP 1022374 A1

EP 1022374 A1 2000-07-26 - Iron and method of producing an iron

Title (en)

Iron and method of producing an iron

Title (de)

Elektrisches Bügeleisen und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines elektrischen Bügeleisens

Title (fr)

Fer à repasser et procédé pour fabriquer un fer à repasser

Publication

EP 1022374 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99101175 A

Priority

EP 99101175 A

Abstract (en)

Electrical flat iron has an aluminum sole with a nickel- and/or chromium-coating deposited galvanic-electrolytically on the sole with a thickness of more than 40 microns. The side of the sole facing outwards has an increasing degree of hardness. An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of an electrical flat iron.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein elektrisches Bügeleisen mit einem aus siliziumhaltigen Aluminiumguß hergestellten und mit einer elektrischen Heizung versehenen Bügeleisenblock (1) mit einer plattenförmigen Bügeleisensohle (3) aus siliziumarmen Aluminium, die an dem Bügeleisenblock wärmeleitend befestigt ist. Um einerseits von den Vorteilen der Aluminiumsohle der guten Formbarkeit und Wärmeleitfähigkeit zu profitieren und anderseits eine hohe Korrosionsbeständigkeit, Verschleißbeständigkeit und ausgezeichnete Härte bei wirtschaftlicher Herstellbarkeit zu erzielen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Bügeleisensohle eine nickel- und/oder chromenthaltende Beschichtung (7) aufweist, die galvanisch-elektrolytisch an der Bügeleisensohle abgeschieden ist, die eine Dicke von mehr als 40µm aufweist und die nach außen zur abgewandten Seite der Aluminiumbügelseisensohle hin im Härtegrad ansteigend strukturiert (8,9,10) ist. Ferner betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen elektrischen Bügeleisens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022374 A1 20000726; EP 1022374 B1 20010718; AT 203288 T 20010815; DE 59900161 D1 20010823; ES 2161559 T3 20011201; HK 1031135 A1 20020607; PL 191847 B1 20060731; PL 337986 A1 20000731; US 6360461 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170103

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: DE'LONGHI BRAUN HOUSEHOLD GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 203288 T

- Effective date: 20150907

2015-09-25 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DE LONGHI BRAUN HOUSEHOLD GMBH

- Effective date: 20150921

2014-11-12 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20141103

2014-10-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DE'LONGHI BRAUN HOUSEHOLD GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20140922

2014-09-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140807 AND 20140813

2014-08-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DE'LONGHI BRAUN HOUSEHOLD GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRAUN GMBH, 61476 KRONBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59900161

- Effective date: 20140701

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050122

2004-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Free text: BO 01/51 PAGES: 265, IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2161559 T3

2001-10-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-10-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-10-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900161 20010823

2001-08-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 203288 T 20010815

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990723

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI