Global Patent Index - EP 1022378 A3

EP 1022378 A3 2000-11-22 - Headbox

Title (en)

Headbox

Title (de)

Stoffauflauf

Title (fr)

Caisse de tête

Publication

EP 1022378 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118677 A

Priority

DE 19902623 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022378A2] The stock inlet for a papermaking machine, with a pulp feed and a turbulence generator, has a path section (I) where the free cross section steadily decreases towards the outlet which is directly followed by a second path section (II) with a steady and continuous expansion to the outlet. The second path section (II) with a flow expansion can be followed by a third path section with a steady and decreasing free flow cross section. The third path section length L3 is shorter than the second (II) length L2, which is shorter than the length L1 of the first path section (I). The structure of the path lengths is expressed as L2<0.3> L3 L2<0.7> and L1<0.1> L2 L1<0.3>. The first path section (I) starts directly after the turbulence generator. The total crosssection of the stock inlet jet is formed by a single suspension flow channel (4) at least over part of the length of the stock inlet jet. Or a number of suspension flow channels are over at least part of the stock inlet jet length of the total cross section of the stock inlet jet, formed by at least one divider between the two limit walls. Without exception, all the suspension flow channels have the same cross section pattern, in a shape which covers each other. The rate of divergence at the second path section (II) is identical for all the suspension flow channels. The dividers form a point towards each other at the second path section (II), each with the same degree of convergence at the ends of their surfaces. The alignment of the upper (1) and/or lower (2) wall of the stock inlet, at least in the second path section (II), is in a mirror image to the line of the adjacent divider in relation to the surfaces in contact with the suspension flow. The turbulence generator has a number of diffusion tubes, arranged in rows across the machine width. The dividers start between the rows of diffusion tubes. The upper and lower walls of the stock inlet have the same length. The ratio of the change in the reducing cross section height in the flow direction to the flow path length in the first path section (I) is 0.3-40.0 % and preferably 10-30%. The ratio of the increasing cross section height in the flow direction to the flow path length in the second path section (II) is 0.1-20.0% and preferably 2-12%. The ratio of the change in the reducing crosssection height in the flow direction to the flow path length in the third path section is 1-400% and preferably 10-200%. The first path section (I) has a length of 250-1000 mm and preferably 400-800 mm. The second path section (II) has a length of 20-150 mm. The length of the third path section is 0.5-300.0 mm and preferably 1-100 mm. The smallest cross section height of the first path section (I) is 10-500 mm, and preferably 15-150 mm, and 30-200 mm at the second path section (II), and 5-80 mm in the third path section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022378 A2 20000726; EP 1022378 A3 20001122; EP 1022378 B1 20031217; AT 256781 T 20040115; DE 19902623 A1 20000727; US 6372092 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120922

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908101

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 256781 T

- Effective date: 20120922

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120922

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120923

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908101 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI