Global patent index - EP 1022390 A1

EP 1022390 A1 2000-07-26 - Gutter

Title (en)

Gutter

Title (de)

Entwässerungsrinne

Title (fr)

Caniveau

Publication

EP 1022390 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810030 A

Priority

CH 9999 D

Abstract (en)

The gutter, as a drain channel for the removal of water, has a longitudinal base (1) and side walls (2) with a number of water guides (4) at the sides (2). The guides (4) have a curvature to lead the water inflow, from above, along the outflow line (R) of the gutter. The upper end surfaces of the water guides (4) act as support surfaces (41) for a covering grid (9), to lie between the side walls (2).

Abstract (de)

Eine Entwässerungsrinne umfasst einen Rinnenkörper mit einem Boden (1) und zwei gegenüberliegenden Seitenwänden (2) in Längsrichtung. An den Seitenwänden (2) sind mehrere Führungselemente (4) für Wasser angebracht, die derart bogenförmig ausgebildet sind, dass sie von oben in die Entwässerungsrinne eintretendes Wasser in die Rinnenlängsrichtung in Abflussrichtung (R) umlenken. Die oberen Endflächen der Führungselemente (4) sind als Auflagen (41) für einen Abdeckrost (9) ausgebildet, der zwischen den beiden Seitenwänden (2) auf den Auflagen (41) ruht. Dadurch, dass durch die bogenförmige Ausbildung der Führungselemente (4) zumindest ein Teil des eintretenden Wassers in die Abflussrichtung (R) umgelenkt wird, wird ein Fliessen des Wassers in der Entwässerungsrinne in die gewünschte Richtung bewirkt bzw. die Fliessgeschindigkeit erhöht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 11/22; E03F 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/22 (2006.01); E03F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/06 (2013.01); E01C 11/227 (2013.01); E03F 2005/068 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3936625 A1 19910508 - ZANKE U PROF DR ING HABIL [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022390 A1 20000726

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030211

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI