Global Patent Index - EP 1022392 A2

EP 1022392 A2 2000-07-26 - A barrier

Title (en)

A barrier

Title (de)

Eine Absperrvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Barrière

Publication

EP 1022392 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99650119 A

Priority

IE 990047 A

Abstract (en)

A barrier (1) has a base unit (2) which is secured to the ground and a top unit (3) which may be connected at any one of four different orientations. An electronic controller (6) is mounted in a door (5) of the base unit (2) so that is may be easily accessed. A drive mechanism (35) is mounted in a modular manner in the top unit (3). It is mounted by virtue of a beam drive shaft (21) which is mounted by bearings (22) at each end to opposed side walls (20) of the top unit (3). The beam is connected to the drive shaft (21) in a symmetrical manner so that the barrier may be used for either the right side or the left side of a laneway. There is excellent support and balance in the drive mechanism because it is connected between support bearings of the beam drive shaft (21). A manual override is provided to release a clutch if an electrical fault arises. The beam has a shear plate (27) which yields to minimise damage to either the drive mechanism or a beam arm (30) in the event of an accidental impact against the beam. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022392 A2 20000726; EP 1022392 A3 20020130

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI