Global Patent Index - EP 1022393 A3

EP 1022393 A3 2003-06-18 - Unattended parking apparatus

Title (en)

Unattended parking apparatus

Title (de)

Nicht überwachte Parkvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil automatique de stationnement

Publication

EP 1022393 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99402587 A

Priority

  • JP 1436199 A
  • JP 1446199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022393A2] An unattended parking apparatus comprising a stopper plate which is moved upwardly towards the bottom surface of a vehicle accessed to a predetermined parking position and which is moved downwardly after the bill has been settled to permit departure of the vehicle, said unattended parking apparatus comprising : a plurality of stopper plates (2, 3) disposed one behind the other in a direction parallel to the longitudinal axis of the vehicle a hydraulic circuit including a plurality of hydraulic cylinders which are operated by a hydraulic pressure source, each hydraulic cylinder being arranged to operate upward and downward movements of a stopper plate, and a relief mechanism arranged to relieve the pressure in each hydraulic cylinder when a load which is exerted on said stopper plates is greater than a predetermined value <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 13/12; E01F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/08 (2006.01); E01F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/12 (2013.01); E01F 13/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022393 A2 20000726; EP 1022393 A3 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01F 13/12 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01F 13/08 B

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI