Global Patent Index - EP 1022399 A1

EP 1022399 A1 2000-07-26 - Emptying device for vacuum sewer system

Title (en)

Emptying device for vacuum sewer system

Title (de)

Entleerungsvorrichtung für Unterdruckabwasseranlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de vidage pour système d'égout sous vide

Publication

EP 1022399 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300093 A

Priority

FI 990111 A

Abstract (en)

A vacuum sewer system comprising at least one sanitary device (1), e.g. a water closet, connected through a normally closed sewer valve (4) to a collecting container (3) maintained in use under partial vacuum by means of a vacuum pump (5) or the like. The collecting container (3) is provided with a discharge means (8-10) comprising a rapidly rotatable discharge conduit (8) arranged, when rotated, to apply an inertia force on the sewage in the discharge conduit in opposition to the force applied on the sewage by the partial vacuum and which is sufficient to discharge sewage from the discharge conduit. The conduit suitably has an inlet end at a rotation axis (7) of the discharge conduit and an outlet end at a considerable radial distance from the rotation axis (7) of the discharge conduit. The outlet end may be provided with a valve means (10) which opens when the inertia force of the liquid in the conduit in the rotating conduit is sufficiently high. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/11 (2006.01); E03F 1/00 (2006.01); E03F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 1/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2012334 A 19790725 - ELECTROLUX AB

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022399 A1 20000726; CN 1261120 A 20000726; FI 105223 B 20000630; FI 990111 A0 19990120; JP 2000213055 A 20000802

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030117

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI