Global Patent Index - EP 1022418 A1

EP 1022418 A1 2000-07-26 - An angular deflection guide

Title (en)

An angular deflection guide

Title (de)

Eckumlenkung

Title (fr)

Déviateur angulaire

Publication

EP 1022418 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124632 A

Priority

DE 29901014 U

Abstract (en)

The corner cable guide for a window frame has a guide channel (11) for a push rod or pull cable. The channel is defined by a housing (13) or rail. A connector connects the cable with push rod travel limiting stops. A compensator for length tolerances in the push rod is mounted in a section of the channel and has a screw operated bearing (17) which adjusts the angler of the guide surface.

Abstract (de)

Beschlag mit Übertragungsgliedern, z.B. Treibstangen oder Zugseilen, -bändern oder ähnlichen und einer Eckumlenkung, wobei die Eckumlenkung einen Führungskanal zur Führung von Umlenkgliedern, ein Gehäuse oder eine Befestigungsleiste zur Aufnahme und/oder Ausbildung des Führungskanals und eine Kupplungsvorrichtung zur Kopplung der Umlenkglieder mit angrenzenden Treibstangenbeschlagteilen aufweist, wobei der Beschlag eine Ausgleichseinrichtung zum Ausgleich von Längentoleranzen des Übertragungsgliedes aufweist und wobei die Ausgleichseinrichtung (15) einen Abschnitt (16) des Führungskanals (11) ausbildet, der entlang einer annähernd Winkelhalbierenden (17) der Eckumlenkung (10) relativ zum Gehäuse (13) bzw. der Befestigungsleiste verlagerbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/06 (2006.01); E05C 9/24 (2006.01); E05F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 7/08 (2013.01); E05C 9/063 (2013.01); E05C 9/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022418 A1 20000726; DE 29901014 U1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI