Global Patent Index - EP 1022419 A2

EP 1022419 A2 2000-07-26 - Compound hinge

Title (en)

Compound hinge

Title (de)

Kompositscharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière composite

Publication

EP 1022419 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101461 A

Priority

  • US 23680599 A
  • US 18859600 P

Abstract (en)

A compound hinge system includes a first link (50) and a second link (70). The first link (50) includes knuckles (54) and arcing engaging surfaces (60) next to stop portions (56) that are configured for receiving engaging lug portions (76) on the second link member (70). The second link member includes first (72) and second (74) sets of knuckles. One of the sets of knuckles (72) cooperates with a hinged pin (28) to pivot relative to the first link (50) while the second set of knuckles (74) receives a hinge pin (28) to pivot relative to the second element (26). The lugs (76) slide relative to the engaging surface (60) and push against the stop portions (56) to flex them outward and require additional force to move between various stops in the range of motion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/12 (2013.01); E05D 3/127 (2013.01); E05D 11/105 (2013.01); E05D 11/1078 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022419 A2 20000726; EP 1022419 A3 20040519; EP 1022419 B1 20071114; DE 60037051 D1 20071227; JP 2000352256 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080214

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080215

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080214

2008-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60037051

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-12-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060314

2005-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20041106

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI