Global Patent Index - EP 1022420 A2

EP 1022420 A2 2000-07-26 - Door track mounting device

Title (en)

Door track mounting device

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Montage einer Türschiene

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage d'un rail de guidage pour porte

Publication

EP 1022420 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300424 A

Priority

US 11658599 P

Abstract (en)

A track mounting device for installing an upper track of a folding or sliding door assembly onto a ceiling surface, comprises a height reducing member (58) having end portions a first bracket (10) and a second bracket (10). The first bracket (10) has a track mounting portion (18) on which the upper track can be fixedly mounted and first mounting structure (30) for mounting said first bracket (10) to one of said end portions of said height reducing member. The second bracket (10) has a ceiling mounting portion (18) for fixing to a ceiling surface, and a second mounting structure (30) for movably mounting said second bracket to the other of said end portions of said height reducing member (58) in such a manner as to allow said ceiling mounting portion (18) to be positioned at a selected angle with respect to said height reducing member (58). <??>The track mounting device may have an orientation indicating device (100) for indicating when said track mounting portion (18) of said first bracket (10) is oriented generally horizontally. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/0691 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022420 A2 20000726; EP 1022420 A3 20041208

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-10-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI