Global Patent Index - EP 1022423 A3

EP 1022423 A3 2001-05-02 - Profile system

Title (en)

Profile system

Title (de)

Profilsystem

Title (fr)

Système de profilé

Publication

EP 1022423 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101171 A

Priority

DE 19902353 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1022423A2] The system of profiled sections for window or door frames consists of at least one plastic hollow profile(1) and at least one aluminum cladding profile (2). The plastic profile has undercuts (13,14) into which fit matching catches on the aluminum cladding profile. The plastic profile and aluminum cladding profile each have a groove-shaped undercut together forming a sealing groove for a seal (3) which rests against the contact surfaces of the plastic hollow profile and aluminum cladding profile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 3/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/306 (2013.01); E06B 2003/6223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1022423 A2 20000726; EP 1022423 A3 20010502; DE 10002658 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061229

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROFINE GMBH

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR NL

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI